|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 2839.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 2141.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 1472.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|