California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB684 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill August 23, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill June 28, 2011
Bill June 13, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011