|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 681, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3211.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2424.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 1462.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|