LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB688
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB688
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB688
Compare Versions
AB688 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB688 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB688 Amended September 2, 2011
AB688 Amended August 24, 2011
AB688 Amended August 15, 2011
AB688 Amended July 12, 2011
AB688 Amended June 23, 2011
AB688 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB688 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB688 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB688 Amended September 2, 2011
AB688 Amended August 24, 2011
AB688 Amended August 15, 2011
AB688 Amended July 12, 2011
AB688 Amended June 23, 2011
AB688 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare