|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 368, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2168.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1044.) (H. & C.D. committee)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|