California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2011

Amended

Bill May 4, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011