|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 1709.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|