LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB723
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB723
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB723
Compare Versions
AB723 Amended August 8, 2012
AB723 Amended June 27, 2012
AB723 Amended June 29, 2011
AB723 Amended June 20, 2011
AB723 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB723 Amended August 8, 2012
AB723 Amended June 27, 2012
AB723 Amended June 29, 2011
AB723 Amended June 20, 2011
AB723 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare