|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 6581.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4900.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 3626.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|