California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB744 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill June 7, 2012
Bill January 23, 2012