California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB792 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 17, 2011
Bill June 30, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011