LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB792
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB792
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB792
Compare Versions
AB792 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB792 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB792 Amended August 24, 2012
AB792 Amended August 21, 2012
AB792 Amended August 17, 2011
AB792 Amended June 30, 2011
AB792 Amended May 27, 2011
AB792 Amended May 10, 2011
AB792 Amended April 14, 2011
AB792 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB792 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB792 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB792 Amended August 24, 2012
AB792 Amended August 21, 2012
AB792 Amended August 17, 2011
AB792 Amended June 30, 2011
AB792 Amended May 27, 2011
AB792 Amended May 10, 2011
AB792 Amended April 14, 2011
AB792 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare