|
09/27/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 6624.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 4941.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Measure version as amended on September 2 corrected.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 1704.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|