LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB796
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB796
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB796
Compare Versions
AB796 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB796 Amended August 24, 2012
AB796 Amended August 6, 2012
AB796 Amended June 26, 2012
AB796 Amended June 12, 2012
AB796 Amended February 27, 2012
AB796 Amended September 2, 2011
AB796 Amended July 13, 2011
AB796 Amended May 11, 2011
AB796 Amended April 25, 2011
AB796 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB796 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB796 Amended August 24, 2012
AB796 Amended August 6, 2012
AB796 Amended June 26, 2012
AB796 Amended June 12, 2012
AB796 Amended February 27, 2012
AB796 Amended September 2, 2011
AB796 Amended July 13, 2011
AB796 Amended May 11, 2011
AB796 Amended April 25, 2011
AB796 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare