|
07/29/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/29/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1846.).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 903.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15).
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 3.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|