California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB80 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/29/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 80CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 138 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 29, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 29, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 14, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 3, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fong (Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Garrick, Gorell, Huffman, and Bonnie Lowenthal) JANUARY 3, 2011 An act to amend Sections 340, 1000, 1001, and 1202 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 80, Fong. Presidential primary: election date. Existing law provides that the presidential primary election is to be held on the first Tuesday in February of those years in which a national presidential election is to be held. This bill would change the date of the presidential primary election to the first Tuesday after the first Monday in June of presidential election years and would consolidate the presidential primary election with the statewide direct primary election. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 340 of the Elections Code is amended to read: 340. "Presidential primary" is the primary election that is held on the first Tuesday after the first Monday in June in any year that is evenly divisible by the number four, and at which delegations to national party conventions are to be chosen. SEC. 2. Section 1000 of the Elections Code is amended to read: 1000. The established election dates in each year are as follows: (a) The second Tuesday of April in each even-numbered year. (b) The first Tuesday after the first Monday in March of each odd-numbered year. (c) The first Tuesday after the first Monday in June in each year. (d) The first Tuesday after the first Monday in November of each year. SEC. 3. Section 1001 of the Elections Code is amended to read: 1001. Elections held in June and November of each even-numbered year are statewide elections and the dates of those elections are statewide election dates. SEC. 4. Section 1202 of the Elections Code is amended to read: 1202. The presidential primary shall be held on the first Tuesday after the first Monday in June in any year that is evenly divisible by the number four, and shall be consolidated with the statewide direct primary held in that year.