|
10/08/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 3144.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2367.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Measure version as amended on June 6 corrected.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 1041.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|