LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB86
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB86
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB86
Compare Versions
AB86 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB86 Amended September 1, 2011
AB86 Amended June 22, 2011
AB86 Amended June 6, 2011
AB86 Introduced January 6, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB86 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB86 Amended September 1, 2011
AB86 Amended June 22, 2011
AB86 Amended June 6, 2011
AB86 Introduced January 6, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare