California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB861 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill July 2, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill June 7, 2012
Bill May 14, 2012
Bill May 27, 2011