LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB861
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB861
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB861
Compare Versions
AB861 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB861 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB861 Amended August 24, 2012
AB861 Amended July 2, 2012
AB861 Amended June 19, 2012
AB861 Amended June 7, 2012
AB861 Amended May 14, 2012
AB861 Amended May 27, 2011
AB861 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB861 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB861 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB861 Amended August 24, 2012
AB861 Amended July 2, 2012
AB861 Amended June 19, 2012
AB861 Amended June 7, 2012
AB861 Amended May 14, 2012
AB861 Amended May 27, 2011
AB861 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare