|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 551, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3145.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1975.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|