LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB873
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB873
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB873
Compare Versions
AB873 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB873 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB873 Amended June 20, 2011
AB873 Amended April 14, 2011
AB873 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB873 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB873 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB873 Amended June 20, 2011
AB873 Amended April 14, 2011
AB873 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare