|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2843.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2130.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 1388.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|