California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB887 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 17, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011