California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB889 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 22, 2012
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 23, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 4, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011