LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB889
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB889
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB889
Compare Versions
AB889 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB889 Amended August 24, 2012
AB889 Amended August 22, 2012
AB889 Amended July 12, 2011
AB889 Amended June 23, 2011
AB889 Amended May 27, 2011
AB889 Amended May 4, 2011
AB889 Amended April 6, 2011
AB889 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB889 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB889 Amended August 24, 2012
AB889 Amended August 22, 2012
AB889 Amended July 12, 2011
AB889 Amended June 23, 2011
AB889 Amended May 27, 2011
AB889 Amended May 4, 2011
AB889 Amended April 6, 2011
AB889 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare