California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB936 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill May 2, 2011