LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB936
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB936
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB936
Compare Versions
AB936 Chaptered September 6, 2011
AB936 Enrolled August 19, 2011
AB936 Amended July 12, 2011
AB936 Amended June 22, 2011
AB936 Amended May 2, 2011
AB936 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB936 Chaptered September 6, 2011
AB936 Enrolled August 19, 2011
AB936 Amended July 12, 2011
AB936 Amended June 22, 2011
AB936 Amended May 2, 2011
AB936 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare