|
02/01/2012
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (January 9).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|