BILL NUMBER: AB 937AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 11, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 30, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Mendoza FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section 39633 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to vessels. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 937, as amended, Mendoza. Vessels: emission reduction control. Existing law regulates emissions from cruise ship engines and oceangoing ship engines. Regulations of the State Air Resources Board require vessel fleets to either reduce onboard power generation to specified levels or achieve equivalent emission reductions. This bill would require permit a vessel at berth or at anchor in the jurisdiction of a California port to use either or both of specified emission reduction compliance options any method to reduce emissions that has been demonstrated to the satisfaction of the state board to reduce emissions to the level that would be achieved by using shore power . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 39633 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 39633. A vessel at berth or at anchor in the jurisdiction of a California port shall use either or both of the following emission reduction compliance options: may use any method to reduce emissions that has been demonstrated to the satisfaction of the state board to reduce emissions to the level that would be achieved by using shore power. (a) Shore power. (b) A state board-approved alternative.