|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 400, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3178.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3036.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 8).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2978.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2315.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2048.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 910.)
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|