LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB946
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB946
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB946
Compare Versions
AB946 Chaptered October 2, 2011
AB946 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB946 Amended August 31, 2011
AB946 Amended August 24, 2011
AB946 Amended August 16, 2011
AB946 Amended July 12, 2011
AB946 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB946 Chaptered October 2, 2011
AB946 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB946 Amended August 31, 2011
AB946 Amended August 24, 2011
AB946 Amended August 16, 2011
AB946 Amended July 12, 2011
AB946 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare