|
10/07/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 3135.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2384.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 1342.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|