LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB947
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB947
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB947
Compare Versions
AB947 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB947 Amended September 2, 2011
AB947 Amended August 30, 2011
AB947 Amended June 28, 2011
AB947 Amended April 27, 2011
AB947 Amended March 10, 2011
AB947 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB947 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB947 Amended September 2, 2011
AB947 Amended August 30, 2011
AB947 Amended June 28, 2011
AB947 Amended April 27, 2011
AB947 Amended March 10, 2011
AB947 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare