|
03/24/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 2, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Measure version as amended on March 17 corrected.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 612.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 613.).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 368.) Amended pursuant to Joint Rule 23.5. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 369.).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (March 16). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 415.)
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|