LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB95
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB95
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB95
Compare Versions
AB95 Chaptered March 24, 2011
AB95 Enrolled March 21, 2011
AB95 Amended March 17, 2011
AB95 Amended March 15, 2011
AB95 Amended March 14, 2011
AB95 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB95 Chaptered March 24, 2011
AB95 Enrolled March 21, 2011
AB95 Amended March 17, 2011
AB95 Amended March 15, 2011
AB95 Amended March 14, 2011
AB95 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare