California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 16, 2011
Bill July 5, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011