LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB952
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB952
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB952
Compare Versions
AB952 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB952 Amended August 16, 2011
AB952 Amended July 5, 2011
AB952 Amended May 10, 2011
AB952 Amended April 25, 2011
AB952 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB952 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB952 Amended August 16, 2011
AB952 Amended July 5, 2011
AB952 Amended May 10, 2011
AB952 Amended April 25, 2011
AB952 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare