|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 579, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2729.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2014.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1452.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|