LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB964
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB964
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB964
Compare Versions
AB964 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB964 Enrolled September 6, 2011
AB964 Amended August 18, 2011
AB964 Amended June 30, 2011
AB964 Amended June 13, 2011
AB964 Amended April 13, 2011
AB964 Amended March 17, 2011
AB964 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB964 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB964 Enrolled September 6, 2011
AB964 Amended August 18, 2011
AB964 Amended June 30, 2011
AB964 Amended June 13, 2011
AB964 Amended April 13, 2011
AB964 Amended March 17, 2011
AB964 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare