|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 738, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6362.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4783.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3604.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|