California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB969 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill June 26, 2012
Bill June 6, 2012
Bill January 23, 2012
Bill March 25, 2011