|
09/27/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 6296.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4692.).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 11).
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 9. Page 1635.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|