LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB976
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB976
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB976
Compare Versions
AB976 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB976 Amended August 6, 2012
AB976 Amended June 25, 2012
AB976 Amended April 25, 2011
AB976 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB976 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB976 Amended August 6, 2012
AB976 Amended June 25, 2012
AB976 Amended April 25, 2011
AB976 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare