|
08/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2011-12 First Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 252.).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 7. Page 182.).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 6). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 127.)
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 116.)
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (March 2).
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (February 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|