LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX114
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX114
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX114
Compare Versions
ABX114 Chaptered August 2, 2011
ABX114 Enrolled July 15, 2011
ABX114 Amended July 1, 2011
ABX114 Amended May 10, 2011
ABX114 Amended March 21, 2011
ABX114 Amended March 1, 2011
ABX114 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
ABX114 Chaptered August 2, 2011
ABX114 Enrolled July 15, 2011
ABX114 Amended July 1, 2011
ABX114 Amended May 10, 2011
ABX114 Amended March 21, 2011
ABX114 Amended March 1, 2011
ABX114 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare