07/14/2011 | Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 2329.) | |||
07/11/2011 | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2259.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 2260.) | |||
07/01/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 43. Noes 15. Page 2158.) | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/23/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/18/2011 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 17). | |||
05/11/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Read first time. To print. |