LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA6
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA6
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA6
Compare Versions
ACA6 Amended July 11, 2011
ACA6 Amended July 1, 2011
ACA6 Amended May 19, 2011
ACA6 Amended May 10, 2011
ACA6 Amended April 14, 2011
ACA6 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
ACA6 Amended July 11, 2011
ACA6 Amended July 1, 2011
ACA6 Amended May 19, 2011
ACA6 Amended May 10, 2011
ACA6 Amended April 14, 2011
ACA6 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare