04/20/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2012. | |||
04/20/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:40 p.m. | |||
04/12/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
04/12/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3130.) | |||
03/20/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/19/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4035.) | |||
03/15/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15). | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. To print. |