California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR111 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 04/20/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 111CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 11 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 20, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 12, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Cook (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Campos, Carter, Cedillo, Chesbro, Conway, Davis, Dickinson, Donnelly, Eng, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Fuentes, Furutani, Beth Gaines, Galgiani, Gatto, Gordon, Grove, Hagman, Halderman, Hayashi, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Jeffries, Jones, Knight, Lara, Logue, Ma, Mansoor, Mendoza, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Morrell, Nielsen, Olsen, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Portantino, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Wagner, Wieckowski, Williams, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 21, 2012 Relative to the Purple Heart State. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 111, Cook. Purple Heart State. This measure would proclaim California as a Purple Heart State, honoring the service and sacrifices of our nation's men and women in uniform wounded or killed by the enemy while serving to protect the freedoms enjoyed by all Americans. WHEREAS, The people of the State of California have a great admiration and the utmost gratitude for all the men and women who have selflessly served their country and this state in the Armed Forces; and WHEREAS, Veterans have paid the high price of freedom by leaving their families and communities and placing themselves in harm's way for the good of all; and WHEREAS, The contributions and sacrifices of the men and women from the State of California who served in the Armed Forces have been vital in maintaining the freedoms and way of life enjoyed by our citizens; and WHEREAS, Many men and women in uniform have given their lives while serving in the Armed Forces; and WHEREAS, Many citizens of our state have earned the Purple Heart Medal as a result of being wounded while engaged in combat with an enemy force, recognized as a singularly meritorious act of essential service; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims California as a Purple Heart State, honoring the service and sacrifices of our nation' s men and women in uniform wounded or killed by the enemy while serving to protect the freedoms enjoyed by all Americans.